+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Subcommittee on Special Issues
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 28, 2017: SB1710 - Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor