+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0727
- Effective Date August 25, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Pensions and Investments; 006-000-000
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Pensions and Investments
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2009
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-001-000
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Personnel and Pensions Committee
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Raoul
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Pensions and Investments; 009-000-000
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
- Do Pass as Amended Pensions and Investments; 006-000-000
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Makes grammatical corrections.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
In provisions concerning proof of duty, occupational disease, or ordinary disability, removes language requiring that the disabled fireman be examined at least once a year. In provisions concerning repayment of a refund due to reentry into service, provides that the applicable interest rate is the actuarially assumed rate (rather than at the rate of 4% per annum).
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Makes grammatical corrections.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 40 ILCS 5/6-153 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 6-153
- 40 ILCS 5/6-154 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 6-154
- 40 ILCS 5/6-159 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 6-159
- 40 ILCS 5/6-227 new -
- 30 ILCS 805/8.33 new -
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2009: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Friday, May 29, 2009
May 14, 2009: SB1705 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 14, 2009
April 1, 2009: SB1705 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 01, 2009
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor