+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (55)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On December 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On November 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Lost 028-018-003
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Insurance & Pensions; 006-000-004
On November 20, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
On November 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur - Consideration Postponed.
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed November 21, 2003
On November 19, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Pension Note Filed as amended by HA #1
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - November 20 ,2003
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance & Pensions
On November 19, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
On November 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Denny Jacobs
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On November 19, 2003 in the House:
- Motion Lost Reconsider Vote 031-081-000
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-018-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 28, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On June 1, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 19(a); May 31, 2003
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-016-002
- Verified
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pension Note Filed As Introduced
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Denny Jacobs
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Amends the Chicago Police, Chicago Firefighter, Chicago Municipal, Chicago Laborers, and Chicago Park District Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Makes changes concerning participation, eligibility, benefits, and the administration of benefits. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/1-105 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 1-105
+ − Votes (4)
November 21, 2003: SB1704 - Motion - Friday, November 21, 2003
November 19, 2003: SB1704 - Third Reading - Wednesday, November 19, 2003
November 19, 2003: SB1704 - Third Reading - Wednesday, November 19, 2003
March 27, 2003: SB1704 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 27, 2003
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor