+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- New Act -
- 720 ILCS 5/16-30 -
- 815 ILCS 505/2Z - from Ch. 121 1/2, par. 262Z
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor