+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (64)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0849
- Effective Date January 1, 2013
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 007-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Financial Institutions
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Financial Institutions
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 4 - May 23, 2012
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 4
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2011
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 2
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Residential Mortgage License Act of 1987, the High Risk Home Loan Act, and the Interest Act. Limits the imposition of prepayment penalties in connection with high risk home loans. Limits the size of balloon payments in connection with high risk home loans. Limits the imposition of late fees. Amends the Tax Refund Anticipation Loan Disclosure Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Tax Refund Anticipation Loan Reform Act. Makes changes concerning disclosure requirements, prohibited activities, interest rate limits for non-bank refund anticipation loans, and defined terms. Provides a calculation for the refund anticipation loan interest rate. Provides that a person who violates the Tax Refund Anticipation Loan Reform Act commits an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Makes conforming changes in the Currency Exchange Act and the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Contains a severability provision. Effective immediately.