+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0330
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2021
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Back To Revenue; 002-000-000
- Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2021
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
- To Revenue- Special Issues
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments