+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- New Act -
- 720 ILCS 5/16-30 -
- 815 ILCS 505/2Z - from Ch. 121 1/2, par. 262Z
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor