+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-000-000
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Restores a provision specifying that by each November 1, each chief procurement officer shall report to the Department of Central Management Services on specified information for the immediately preceding fiscal year, and by each March 1 the Department of Central Management Services shall compile and report that information to the General Assembly.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
March 28, 2019: SB1680 - Third Reading
March 20, 2019: SB1680 - Executive
March 20, 2019: SCA0001 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor