+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On September 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor