+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0220
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
- Arrived in House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 23, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 740 ILCS 21/10 -
- 740 ILCS 22/213 -
- 815 ILCS 518/5 -
- 815 ILCS 615/15 - from Ch. 29, par. 1051-15
+ − Votes (4)
May 26, 2021: SB1677 - Third Reading
May 11, 2021: SB1677 - Judiciary - Criminal
April 21, 2021: SB1677
March 16, 2021: SB1677 - Criminal Law
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor