+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Held in Executive; Subcommittee on State and Local Governments
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive; Subcommittee on State and Local Governments
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- To Executive Subcommittee on State And Local Government
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor