+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0081
- Effective Date July 9, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-003-000
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Pensions; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Pensions
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Pensions
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that as a condition of being eligible for the benefits in a provision concerning firefighters who participated in more than one pension fund, a person who first becomes a firefighter under the Article (instead of a person who is hired to a position as a firefighter) after December 31, 2010 must notify specified entities and make certain contributions. Makes a conforming change. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 21, 2021: SB0167 - Third Reading
May 6, 2021: SB0167 - Personnel & Pensions
April 21, 2021: SB0167 - Third Reading
April 14, 2021: SB0167 - Pensions
April 14, 2021: SCA0001 - Pensions
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor