+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (75)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-1047
- Effective Date October 18, 2004
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Executive; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Executive; 010-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01. 02-July 24, 2004
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules; 3-9(b)
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules; 3-9 (b)
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Louis S. Viverito
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Louis S. Viverito
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Louis S. Viverito
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Held in Executive; Senator Viverito
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Held in Executive; Senator Viverito
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Louis S. Viverito
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Executive; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Executive; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Carol Ronen
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Carol Ronen
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02 - May 23, 2003
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Veterans Affairs Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Veterans Affairs Committee; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2003
- Re-assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Arrived in House
- Verified
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-016-002
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carol Ronen
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Law Enforcement Officers, Civil Defense Workers, Civil Air Patrol Members, Paramedics, Firemen, Chaplains, and State Employee Compensation Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Line of Duty Compensation Act (and amends other Acts to change cross-references to the changed short title). Provides that death benefits are payable to an Illinois resident: who is a member of the Armed Forces of the United States or a member of the Illinois National Guard or any reserve component of the Armed Forces of the United States while on active military service pursuant to an order of the President of the United States; and who is killed in the line of duty while on active duty in the Iraq and Arabian Peninsula Combat Zone between January 1, 2003 and the date that all United States Armed Forces have been redeployed from Iraq. Defines "Iraq and Arabian Peninsula Combat Zone". Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Law Enforcement Officers, Civil Defense Workers, Civil Air Patrol Members, Paramedics, Firemen, Chaplains, and State Employee Compensation Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Line of Duty Compensation Act (and amends other Acts to change cross-references to the changed short title). Provides that death benefits are payable to an Illinois resident: who is a member of the Armed Forces of the United States or a member of the Illinois National Guard or any reserve component of the Armed Forces of the United States while on active military service pursuant to an order of the President of the United States; and who is killed in the line of duty while on active duty in the Iraq and Arabian Peninsula Combat Zone between January 1, 2003 and the date that all United States Armed Forces have been redeployed from Iraq. Defines "Iraq and Arabian Peninsula Combat Zone". Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 305/4a-1 - from Ch. 48, par. 138.4a-1