+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0045
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 28, 2011
On June 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-039-001
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 007-001-000
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-002-000
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2011
- Second Reading
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2011
- Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
+ − Statute Amended
- 235 ILCS 5/6-15 - from Ch. 43, par. 130
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2011: SB1668 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 05, 2011
March 31, 2011: SB1668 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 31, 2011
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor