+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- New Act -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.675 new -
- 30 ILCS 330/2 - from Ch. 127, par. 652
- 30 ILCS 330/6 - from Ch. 127, par. 656
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor