+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0516
- Effective Date August 28, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 24, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 14, 2007 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 019-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2007
- Do Pass Environment and Energy; 012-000-000
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter