+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Held in Labor
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Co-Sponsor Sen. J. Bradley Burzynski
- Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
- Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
- Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Cronin
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Randall M. Hultgren
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 405/1505 - from Ch. 48, par. 575
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor