+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0260
- Effective Date August 17, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Ruth Munson
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-001
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2007
- Do Pass Transportation; 010-000-000
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2007: SB0166 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
March 27, 2007: SB0166 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 27, 2007
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor