+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Tabled
- Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Mark L. Walker
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 011-000-000
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Financial Institutions; 009-000-000
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 765 ILCS 905/2 - from Ch. 95, par. 52
- 765 ILCS 905/4 - from Ch. 95, par. 54