+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-001-000
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. John M. Cabello
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-001-000
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 012-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConnaughay
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015
- Second Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-001
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that nothing in the new provision shall be a limitation on the cross examination of the witness as to any other question related to that witness's interest or bias.