+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
- Second Reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2017
- Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Public Health
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 4, 2017: SB1655 - Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor