+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0624
- Effective Date August 27, 2021
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-002-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2021
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 015-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dan Brady
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 014-000-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Joyce
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2021
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Amends the Eminent Domain Act. Provides that quick-take proceedings may be used for a period of no more than one year after the effective date by the City of Decatur and Macon County for the acquisition of certain described property for the purpose of obtaining the necessary right-of-way for the construction of a grade separation of Brush College Road over Faries Parkway and the Norfolk Southern Railroad in Decatur, Illinois. Repeals the new language 2 years after the effective date.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the introduced bill, and makes the following changes: Corrects a typographical error in the description of the property transferred to the City of Wyoming. Authorizes the Director of the Department of Natural Resources to convey certain property in the counties of Cook, Grundy, and Macoupin. Effective immediately.