+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS)
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/5-5.4 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-5.4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor