+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On November 4, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
On October 27, 2005 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Eileen Lyons
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 2, 2005
- Arrived in House
On October 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 054-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Christine Radogno
On October 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 25, 2005
On August 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On June 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2005 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On May 19, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed
On May 17, 2005 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
On May 12, 2005 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eileen Lyons
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Eileen Lyons
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 5, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 4, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jack D. Franks
On April 27, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On April 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2005
- Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 540/3-2 - from Ch. 127, par. 132.403-2
+ − Votes (3)
October 26, 2005: SB1654 - Motion - Wednesday, October 26, 2005
May 20, 2005: SB1654 - Third Reading - Friday, May 20, 2005
April 15, 2005: SB1654 - Third Reading - Friday, April 15, 2005
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor