+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Rules
- Motion Prevailed
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Sen. Vince Demuzio; Viverito, Cullerton, Petka, Roskam - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-7, re-refer back to the Senate Rules Committee.
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statute Amended
- 705 ILCS 405/2-19 - from Ch. 37, par. 802-19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor