+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor