+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0420
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs 053-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2015
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 011-000-000
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 012-000-000
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015
- Second Reading
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015
- Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 014-000-000
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Changes the program from a waiver to a deferral of deposit. Provides that to be eligible for the deferral, the domestic violence must have been the basis for the issuance of an order of protection or be certified by certain officials.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (6)
May 31, 2015: HFA0001 - Concurrence - Sunday, May 31, 2015
May 30, 2015: SB1645 - Third Reading - Saturday, May 30, 2015
May 20, 2015: HFA0001 - Public Utilities - May 20, 2015
April 28, 2015: SB1645 - Public Utilities - Apr 28, 2015
April 15, 2015: SB1645 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 15, 2015
March 19, 2015: SB1645 - Energy and Public Utilities - Mar 19, 2015
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor