+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (57)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0672
- Effective Date April 2, 2004
- Governor Approved
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Sent to the Governor
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-April 01, 2004
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Barack Obama
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Labor & Commerce; 006-003-000
- Balanced Budget Note Filed as amended with House Amendment No. 1 from the Governor's Office of Management and Budget.
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 036-019-000
- Passed Both Houses
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-032-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Barack Obama
- Correctional Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Judicial Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor Committee; 008-003-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor Committee
- State Debt Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Pension Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2003
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-016-002
- Verified
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carol Ronen
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Provides that overtime compensation provisions do not apply to (1) any employee of a governmental body excluded from the definition of "employee" under certain provisions of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 (instead of do not apply to any governmental body) or (2) persons employed in an executive, administrative, or professional capacity, as defined by or covered by the Federal Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 and the rules adopted under that Act, as both exist on March 30, 2003, but compensated at the amount of salary specified in certain provisions of the Code of Federal Regulations as proposed in the Federal Register on March 31, 2003 or a greater amount of salary as may be adopted by the United States Department of Labor (instead of as defined by or covered by that Act "as now or hereafter amended"). Provides that a governmental body is not in violation of the overtime compensation provisions if it provides compensatory time pursuant to certain provisions of the Federal Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 or is engaged in fire protection or law enforcement activities and meets certain requirements of that Act. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 105/7 - from Ch. 48, par. 1007