+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0145
- Effective Date July 14, 2011
- Governor Approved
On June 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-035-001
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 015-003-000
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 035-010-000
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2011
- Second Reading
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2011
- Do Pass Education; 007-001-002
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/27-24.2 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-24.2
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2011: SB1643 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 05, 2011
March 31, 2011: SB1643 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 31, 2011
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor