+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0560
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 23, 2019
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 008-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-014-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2019
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 046-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2019
- Second Reading
- Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 007-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
- Postponed - Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
- Postponed - Human Services
- Assigned to Human Services
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission (ISAC) to annually include information about the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) in the language that schools are required to provide to students eligible for the Monetary Award Program grant (rather than requiring ISAC to identify and flag college students who are potentially eligible to receive SNAP benefits). Provides that the language shall, at a minimum, direct students to information about college student eligibility criteria for SNAP, and direct students to the Department of Human Services and to the Illinois Hunger Coalition's Hunger Hotline for additional information. Requires Illinois institutions of higher education that participate in the Monetary Award Program (MAP) to provide the notice to all students who are enrolled, or who are accepted for enrollment and intending to enroll, and who have been identified by ISAC as MAP-eligible at the institution (rather than requiring ISAC to develop, in consultation with the Department of Human Services, an electronic notice for institutions of higher education that includes, at a minimum, college student SNAP eligibility criteria, the Application for Benefits Eligibility's website address, and the Illinois Hunger Coalition's Hunger Hotline).
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, but with the following changes and additions: Provides that the Department of Human Services shall consult with the Illinois Workforce Innovation Board (rather than with the Illinois Workforce Investment Board) to establish a protocol to identify and verify all potential exemptions to certain federal eligibility rules under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP). Provides that a career and technical educational program approved by the Illinois Community College Board that could be a component of a SNAP Employment and Training (E&T) program, as identified by the Department of Human Services, shall be considered an employment and training program under a specified provision of the Code of Federal Regulations, unless prohibited by federal law. In provisions requiring the Illinois Student Assistance Commission (ISAC) to adopt rules concerning SNAP eligibility notifications to college students, requires ISAC to adopt the rules on or before October 1, 2020 (rather than on or before October 1, 2019). Effective immediately.