+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (68)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0595
- Effective Date December 5, 2019
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Ann Gillespie
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed to Suspend House Rule(s) for Immediate Consideration Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Prevailed to Suspend Rule by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - November 14, 2019
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 048-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 048-000-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-005-000
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000
- Assigned to State Government
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Modifies the lobbyist registration and disclosure requirements. Requires the Secretary of State to create a publicly accessible and searchable database bringing together disclosures by registered lobbyists, contributions by registered lobbyists, and statements of economic interests required to be filed by State officials and employees. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Creates a uniform statement of economic interest form that must be completed by all persons who are required to file that form under the Act. Changes the nature of the required disclosures that must be made. Requires candidates filing for Supreme Court Judge, appellate court judge, circuit court judge, or judicial retention to file his or her statement of economic interests in written or printed form. Repeals a provision that established a separate form for persons required to file a statement of economic interests with county clerks. Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Modifies the lobbyist registration and disclosure requirements. Requires the Secretary of State to create a publicly accessible and searchable database bringing together disclosures by registered lobbyists, contributions by registered lobbyists, and statements of economic interests required to be filed by State officials and employees. Defines terms. Adds applicability clause. Makes conforming changes. Effective upon becoming law, except that Sections 5 and 10 take effect January 1, 2020.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Personnel Code. Provides that, for any position filled after December 31, 2019, no person may be appointed to a position based in the State of Illinois from any eligible list unless that person becomes a resident of the State of Illinois within 3 months from the person's first day of employment in that position or unless the residency requirement is waived for just cause by the Director of Central Management Services. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (21)
- 20 ILCS 415/8b.1 - from Ch. 127, par. 63b108b.1
- 5 ILCS 420/1-102.5 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/1-104.3 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/1-104.4 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/1-104.5 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/1-105.2 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/1-105.3 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/1-105.5 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/1-105.6 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/1-105.7 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/1-110 - from Ch. 127, par. 601-110
- 5 ILCS 420/1-112.5 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/1-113.6 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/1-113.7 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-102 - from Ch. 127, par. 604A-102
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-103 - from Ch. 127, par. 604A-103
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-108 -
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-104 rep. -
- 25 ILCS 170/2 - from Ch. 63, par. 172
- 25 ILCS 170/5 -
- 25 ILCS 170/7 - from Ch. 63, par. 177