+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0326
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-000-000
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
- Arrived in House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 25, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 225 ILCS 20/5 - from Ch. 111, par. 6355
- 225 ILCS 20/8 - from Ch. 111, par. 6358
- 225 ILCS 20/9A - from Ch. 111, par. 6359A
- 225 ILCS 20/11 - from Ch. 111, par. 6361
+ − Votes (4)
May 27, 2021: SB1632 - Third Reading
May 5, 2021: SB1632 - Health Care Licenses
April 21, 2021: SB1632
March 17, 2021: SB1632 - Licensed Activities
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor