+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor