+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood
+ − Statute Amended
- 15 ILCS 5/1 - from Ch. 127, par. 63b122
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor