+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Held in Education
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.25g - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.25g
- 105 ILCS 5/27-6 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor