+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Held in Licensed Activities
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Statute Amended
- 225 ILCS 90/17 - from Ch. 111, par. 4267
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor