+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 5/3-1 - from Ch. 15, par. 303-1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor