+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
- Session Sine Die
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 042-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019
- Second Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
- Do Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Assigned to State Government
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Commission on Discrimination and Hate Crimes Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Adds the Lieutenant Governor as a member of the Illinois Complete Count Commission. Provides that any vacancies occurring on or after the effective date of this amendatory Act may be filled by the Lieutenant Governor. Provides that the Lieutenant Governor (currently, Secretary of State) shall serve as chairperson of the Commission. Provides that the census outreach strategy shall have a strategic focus on addressing hard to count and underserved communities that the census historically overlooks, including, among other groups, homeless persons, senior citizens, and veterans. Provides for the creation of local Complete Count Committees (currently, local Complete Count Commissions). Requires the Commission to form relationships with specified independent organizations for the purpose of creating Complete Count Committees. Requires the Commission to issue a report (currently, final report) specifying its recommended outreach strategy for implementation for the 2020 Census no later than January 1, 2020 (currently, June 30 2019). Requires the Commission to submit a final report to the General Assembly no later than December 31, 2020 detailing the work of the Commission concerning outreach, promotion, and community support during the 2020 calendar year. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.