+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- 110 ILCS 205/6 - from Ch. 144, par. 186
- 110 ILCS 205/6.2 - from Ch. 144, par. 186.2
- 110 ILCS 205/7 - from Ch. 144, par. 187
- 110 ILCS 205/8 - from Ch. 144, par. 188
- 110 ILCS 205/9.07 - from Ch. 144, par. 189.07
- 110 ILCS 205/9.08 - from Ch. 144, par. 189.08
- 110 ILCS 205/9.16 - from Ch. 144, par. 189.16
- 110 ILCS 205/12 - from Ch. 144, par. 192
- 110 ILCS 805/2-26 new -
- 110 ILCS 805/3-2 - from Ch. 122, par. 103-2
- 110 ILCS 805/3-3 - from Ch. 122, par. 103-3
- 110 ILCS 805/3-22.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 103-22.1
- 110 ILCS 805/3-25.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 103-25.1
- 110 ILCS 805/3-29.8 -
- 110 ILCS 805/3-40 - from Ch. 122, par. 103-40
- 110 ILCS 805/5-11 - from Ch. 122, par. 105-11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor