+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0580
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 014-000-000
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Insurance
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2019
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 017-000-000
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
- Arrived in House
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
- Do Pass Insurance; 017-000-000
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Changes the immediate effective date to January 1, 2020.
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that if an insurance policy or medical assistance coverage includes mammogram coverage, the coverage shall not impose a deductible, coinsurance, copayment, or any other cost-sharing requirement on the coverage provided. Exempts coverage of diagnostic mammograms to the extent such coverage would disqualify a high-deductible health plan from eligibility for a health savings account. Defines "diagnostic mammogram" and "diagnostic mammography". Corrects a typographical error.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1069 - from Ch. 34, par. 5-1069
- 65 ILCS 5/10-4-2 - from Ch. 24, par. 10-4-2
- 215 ILCS 5/356g - from Ch. 73, par. 968g
- 215 ILCS 125/4-6.1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1408.7
- 305 ILCS 5/5-5 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-5
+ − Votes (7)
May 30, 2019: HFA0001 - Concurrence
May 30, 2019: HFA0001 - Insurance
May 24, 2019: SB0162 - Third Reading
May 8, 2019: SB0162 - Human Services
April 11, 2019: SB0162 - Third Reading
April 3, 2019: SFA0001 - Insurance
March 13, 2019: SB0162 - Insurance
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor