+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2005
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2005
- Do Pass Appropriations III; 007-005-000
On April 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations III
On April 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations III
On April 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations III
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 2-10 The following deadlines are not applicable (March 17, 2005 Senate Bills Out of Committee & April 15, 2005 Senate Bills Third Reading)
- Postponed - Appropriations III
On March 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations III
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations III
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor