+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 6, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0325
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Higher Education; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Higher Education
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Bill Cunningham
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2021
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 012-000-000
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Higher Education; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Adds 4 members of the General Assembly to the membership of the Task Force.
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the Board of Higher Education may consult with the Office of the Attorney General, as necessary, during the Board's review of complaints submitted by students regarding specific questions on the survey. With respect to violations of the amendatory provisions, provides that the Board of Higher Education may impose a civil penalty not to exceed $50,000 (rather than $150,000) on an institution of higher education.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (7)
May 30, 2021: HCA0001 - Concurrence
May 30, 2021: HCA0001 - Higher Education
May 27, 2021: SB1610 - Third Reading
May 12, 2021: SB1610 - Higher Education
April 23, 2021: SB1610 - Third Reading
April 20, 2021: SFA0001 - Higher Education
March 16, 2021: SB1610 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor