+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 29, 2011
- Do Pass as Amended Energy; 017-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs
- Postponed - Energy
- Assigned to Energy
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause and reinserts the introduced bill with the following changes: no longer requires the procurement plan for an electric utility to include proposed bidding rules, bid documents, standard form contracts, and credit documents and policies; no longer requires that copies of the draft procurement plan be provided to each alternative retail electric supplier; removes language that includes alternative retail electric suppliers as interested entities that may comment on the procurement plan within a certain timeframe; no longer requires that the Agency endeavor at all times to identify interested parties and proactively seek out comment from parties affected by Agency proposals concerning the draft procurement plan; removes language that gives the Commission the power to reject any subsequent supplements, amendments, or modifications proposed by the Agency to its final version of the procurement plan filed with the Commission; and removes language that gives the Commission power to specifically require and direct the Agency to take certain actions concerning the final procurement plan. Effective immediately.