+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education Subcommittee on Special Issues
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: SB1604 - Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED) - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor