+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive Subcommittee on Special Issues
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 15 ILCS 335/2 - from Ch. 124, par. 22
- 15 ILCS 335/5 - from Ch. 124, par. 25
- 15 ILCS 335/8 - from Ch. 124, par. 28
- 625 ILCS 5/6-101 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-101
- 625 ILCS 5/6-103 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-103
- 625 ILCS 5/6-106 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-106
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: SB1600 - Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor