+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (59)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0207
- Effective Date August 2, 2019
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ann Gillespie
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2019
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ann Gillespie
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mark L. Walker
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- To Income Tax Subcommittee
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019
- Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
- Postponed - Revenue
- Postponed - Revenue
- Assigned to Revenue
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the research and development credit applies for taxable years ending prior to January 1, 2027 (currently, January 1, 2022). Creates an income tax credit for qualified education expenses incurred by an employer on behalf of a qualifying apprentice, subject to certain limitations. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Makes changes to the introduced bill to provide that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall certify qualified data centers (in the introduced bill, the Department of Revenue). Provides that contractors or subcontractors of qualified data centers shall comply with certain responsible bidder requirements of the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that those contractors shall enter into project labor agreements. Adds provisions to the introduced bill amending the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in the amount of 20% of the wages paid during the taxable year to a full-time or part-time employee of a construction contractor employed by a certified data center if those wages are paid for the construction of a new data center in a geographic area that meets certain criteria related to poverty or unemployment.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 20 ILCS 2505/2505-810 new -
- 35 ILCS 105/3-5 -
- 35 ILCS 110/3-5 -
- 35 ILCS 115/3-5 -
- 35 ILCS 120/2-5 -
- 35 ILCS 640/2-4 -
- 20 ILCS 605/605-1025 new -
- 35 ILCS 5/229 new -
- 35 ILCS 5/201 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-201