+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (53)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0043
- Effective Date June 28, 2013
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 047-008-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 047-008-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 29, 2013
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-050-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 006-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 In line by 3PM. Timely filed in accordance with House Rule 18(e).
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013
- Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000
- Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Chicago Police, Fire, Municipal, and Laborer Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. With respect to payments made by the Funds to the City of Chicago to defray the cost of annuitant participation in the City's health care plans, provides that the payments continue until such time as the city no longer provides a health care plan for its annuitants or December 31, 2016, whichever comes first. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 002
Further amends the Chicago Municipal and Chicago Laborers Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Authorizes the Retirement Board of the Municipal Employees', Officers', and Officials' Annuity and Benefit Fund to pay to the city or the board of education, as applicable, $95 per month for each annuitant who participates in a health plan offered by the city or the board of education, as applicable, and who is not eligible to receive Medicare benefits and $65 per month for each such annuitant who is eligible to receive Medicare benefits. Authorizes the Retirement Board of the Laborers' and Retirement Board Employees' Annuity and Benefit Fund to pay to the board of education $95 per month for each annuitant who participates in a health plan offered by the board of education and who is not eligible to receive Medicare benefits and $65 per month for each such annuitant who is eligible to receive Medicare benefits.
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 40 ILCS 5/9-134 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 9-134
- 40 ILCS 5/9-160 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 9-160
- 40 ILCS 5/9-134 -
- 40 ILCS 5/9-160 -
- 40 ILCS 5/5-167.5 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 5-167.5
- 40 ILCS 5/6-164.2 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 6-164.2
- 40 ILCS 5/8-164.1 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 8-164.1
- 40 ILCS 5/11-160.1 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 11-160.1
- 40 ILCS 5/8-164.2 -
- 40 ILCS 5/11-160.2 -