+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. James H. Meyer
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2007
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 009-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Amends the Health Facilities Planning Act. Provides that the term "health care facilities" does not include certain institutions, places, buildings, rooms, or freestanding diagnostic imaging centers that are wholly owned by Illinois licensed physicians who practice at those locations.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20 ILCS 3960/3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1153
- 20 ILCS 3960/19.6 -