+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0584
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 31, 2007
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-042-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Susan Garrett
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - June 1, 2007
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Health Care Availability and Access Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Availability and Access Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 008-004-000
- Assigned to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karen May
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
- Assigned to Human Services
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Department of Public Health shall issue an annual Freestanding Emergency Center (FEC) license until June 30, 2009. Provides that to be eligible for a license, a facility must be within 20 (instead of 15) miles of the hospital that controls the FEC. Removes a requirement that a facility submit a copy of a certificate of need or other permit issued by the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Board (IHFPB). Provides that an application prescribed by the IHFPB shall be filed with the Board in order that the Board may determine whether an applicant has met all the criteria set forth in the FEC provisions. Provides that the application shall be scheduled for hearing for approval within 45 days after being declared complete and that if approval is given, a Certificate of Approval shall be issued and a copy forwarded to the licensure division of the Department of Public Health within 7 business days.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Department of Public Health shall issue an annual Freestanding Emergency Center (FEC) license until June 30, 2009. Provides that to be eligible for a license, a facility must be within 20 (instead of 15) miles of the hospital that controls the FEC. Removes a requirement that a facility submit a copy of a certificate of need or other permit issued by the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Board (IHFPB). Provides that an application prescribed by the IHFPB shall be filed with the Board in order that the Board may determine whether an applicant has met all the criteria set forth in the FEC provisions. Provides that the application shall be scheduled for hearing for approval within 45 days after being declared complete and that if approval is given, a Certificate of Approval shall be issued and a copy forwarded to the licensure division of the Department of Public Health within 7 business days.