+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (54)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0525
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2012
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 25, 2011
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 021-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 010-000-006
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2011
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
- Postponed - Education
- Held in Education
- Assigned to Education
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
With respect to counties of 2,000,000 or more inhabitants, provides that, of the maximum 4 days permitted for district, regional, or county inservice training workshops or equivalent professional educational experiences, 2 days may be used as a teacher's and educational support personnel workshop, when approved by the regional superintendent of schools, up to 2 days may be used for conducting parent-teacher conferences, or up to 2 days may be utilized as parental institute days (now, 2 days may be used for conducting parent-teacher conferences and up to 2 days may be utilized as parental institute days). Provides that educational support personnel may be exempt from a workshop if (i) the workshop is not relevant to the work they do and (ii) the workshop is not related to the health and safety of students.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
With respect to counties of 2,000,000 or more inhabitants, provides that, of the maximum 4 days permitted for district, regional, or county inservice training workshops or equivalent professional educational experiences, 2 days may be used as a teacher's and educational support personnel workshop, when approved by the regional superintendent of schools, up to 2 days may be used for conducting parent-teacher conferences, or up to 2 days may be utilized as parental institute days (now, 2 days may be used for conducting parent-teacher conferences and up to 2 days may be utilized as parental institute days). Provides that educational support personnel may be exempt from a workshop if (i) the workshop is not relevant to the work they do and (ii) the workshop is not related to the health and safety of students.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that educational support personnel may be exempt from a workshop if (i) the workshop is not relevant to the work they do and (ii) the workshop is not related to the health and safety of students; makes a related change.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/3-11 - from Ch. 122, par. 3-11
- 105 ILCS 5/24-3 - from Ch. 122, par. 24-3